Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969295

EP0969295 - Optical waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.04.2004  [2004/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD.
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Asahi Glass Company Ltd.
1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8305 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Katsumi, Asahi Glass Company Ltd.
1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221 / JP
02 / Matsukura, Ikuo, Asahi Glass Company Ltd.
1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112792.902.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018931103.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18931198
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969295
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969295
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969295
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02B1/04, G02B6/02
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/40]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Wellenleiter[2000/01]
English:Optical waveguide[2000/01]
French:Guide d'ondes optiques[2000/01]
Examination procedure25.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
20.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2003Fee for grant paid
13.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0488390  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1,2 * * page 4, line 28 - line 39 *;
 [A]EP0767467  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 * * page 3, line 55 - page 6, line 14 *;
 [A]EP0459132  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 *;
 [A]EP0357354  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,4,5,7,9 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 17 *;
 [PA]EP0907088  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1 * claim 1 * * page 2, line 15 - line 19 * * page 6, line 49 - page 10, line 10 *;
 [A]EP0421387  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 3, line 28 - line 51 *