Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969667

EP0969667 - Pay broadcasting system with enhanced security against illegal access to a down loaded program in a subscriber terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Masuda, Isao
4-1-18-307, Daita, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo 155-0033 / JP
02 / Goto, Yoshimasa
3-27-8, Hiradobashi, Miyamae-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 216-0000 / JP
03 / Harada, Takenosuke
2-24-4-706, Minamiyamada, Tsuzuki-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 224-0029 / JP
04 / Machida, Kazuhiro
2-1-1-505, Oguradai
Inzai-shi, Chiba-ken 270-1356 / JP
05 / Kataoka, Mitsuteru
3-4-2-503, Daigiri
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken 251-0002 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112808.302.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998020109002.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20109098
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969667
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969667
Date:07.01.2004
[2004/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/16
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/40]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gebührenpflichtiges Rundfunksystem mit erhöhtem Schutz gegen den unerlaubten Zugriff zu einer heruntergeladenen Datei in einem Teilnehmerendgerät[2000/01]
English:Pay broadcasting system with enhanced security against illegal access to a down loaded program in a subscriber terminal[2000/01]
French:Système de télédiffusion à payement comportant une protection accrue contre l'accès illégal à des programmes téléchargés dans un terminal d'un abonné[2000/01]
Examination procedure21.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/40]
19.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/13]
27.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/13]
Divisional application(s)EP05009115.6  / EP1562378
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0704785  (MITSUBISHI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; column 46, line 1 - line 12 *;
 [A]US4533949  (FUJIMURA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 5 - line 18 *;
 [A]US5754651  (BLATTER HAROLD [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 5 *
 [X]  - MENEZES VANSTONE, OORSCHOT, Handbook of Applied Cryptography, USA, CRC PRESS LLC, (1997), XP002259291 [X] 1-17 * page 36 *; page 551 - page 553 *