Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968808

EP0968808 - Back pressure control for an injection moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
9-11, Kitashinagawa 5-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8686 / JP
[2012/45]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
9-11, Kitashinagawa 5-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8686 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hara, Hitoshi
6-9-4, Takinoi
Funabashi-shi, Chiba 274-0073 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Geyer, Ulrich F. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER
Patentanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[2012/45]
Former [2000/01]Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112823.202.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018713002.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18713098
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968808
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968808
Date:08.10.2003
[2003/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968808
Date:07.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/77
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2004/27]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gegendrucksteuerung für eine Spritzgiessmaschine[2000/01]
English:Back pressure control for an injection moulding machine[2000/01]
French:Contrôle de la contre-pression d'une machine de moulage par injection[2000/01]
Examination procedure07.04.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/24]
23.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2012Fee for grant paid
24.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2007
Opposition(s)08.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
26.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB02.07.2013
[2014/21]
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH09216266  ;
 [A]EP0230488  (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO [JP]) [A] 1-25 * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]JPS63126716  ;
 [A]JPH09300410  ;
 [A]JPS62234912
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, [X] 1-25 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881007), vol. 012, no. 376, Database accession no. (M - 750), [A] 1-25 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, [A] 1-25 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880406), vol. 012, no. 105, Database accession no. (M - 681), [A] 1-25 * abstract *
by applicantJPH0428533B