blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968851


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
09.04.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
18.04.2003 (Expected) grant published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
09.04.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.11.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.08.2002 Renewal fee
17.06.2002 Examination report or reply
08.02.2002 First examination report
05.02.2002 Examination report or reply
09.08.2001 Renewal fee
02.10.2000 Change - extension states
11.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
20.04.2000 Request for examination filed published on  07.06.2000 [2000/23]
26.11.1999 Publication of search report published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]