blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968851
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000019190Global Dossier 21.01.2000A
Priority number Date
JP18833098 03.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0968851Global Dossier 04.06.2003B1
EP0968851 12.01.2000A3
EP0968851 05.01.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP18833098 03.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69908493T 18.12.2003T2
DE69908493D 10.07.2003D1
Priority number Date
JP18833098 03.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6267509 31.07.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP18833098 03.07.1998