Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0968851

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 ITLapse: 04.06.2003
Examination procedure31.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted04.06.2003
Opposition procedure05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.05.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR IT
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:07.06.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000411
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR IT
 
Event date:27.03.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20020208
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20030604
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR IT
 
Event date:10.07.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69908493
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030710
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:02.04.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:26.05.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040305
 
Event date:29.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20150629
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160801
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20170331
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180619
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:02.07.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69908493 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT