Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968851

EP0968851 - Wheel bearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisenba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD.
5-8, Minamisenba 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Morimura, Naoki, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd.
5-8, Minamisemba, 3-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 542 / JP
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99112831.502.07.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateJP1998018833003.07.1998         Original published format: JP 18833098
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968851
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0968851
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968851
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60C23/04
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Radlagervorrichtung[2000/01]
English:Wheel bearing device[2000/01]
French:Dispositif de palier de roue[2000/01]
Examination procedure11.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/23]
08.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2003Fee for grant paid
31.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.06.2003
[2008/16]
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5567058  (MORITA KOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 14 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-4 * [A] 3