Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971221

EP0971221 - Acoustic leak detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED
Roke Manor, Old Salisbury Lane Romsey
Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED
Roke Manor, Old Salisbury Lane
Romsey, Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Richardson, Christopher Keith
10 Fielders Way
East Wellow, Romsey, Hampshire SO51 6EX / GB
02 / Mansbridge, John
53F Kingsway, Chandlers Ford
Eastleih, Hampshire SO53 1FH / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)French, Clive Harry , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]French, Clive Harry , et al
Siemens AG, PO Box 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Mackett, Margaret Dawn , et al
Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date99112842.202.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateGB1998001469508.07.1998         Original published format: GB 9814695
GB1999001486525.06.1999         Original published format: GB 9914865
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971221
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971221
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01M3/24
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/45]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Akustische Leckdetektion[2000/02]
English:Acoustic leak detection[2000/02]
French:Détection acoustique de fuite[2000/02]
Examination procedure16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
25.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/32]
09.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]GB2289602  (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) [DA] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH08270022
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [A] 1-18 * abstract *