blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974275

EP0974275 - Sterilisation process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRANZ ZENTIS GMBH & CO.
Jülicher Strasse 177
52070 Aachen / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Otte, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Walheimer Strasse 136
52076 Aachen / DE
02 / Brack, Holger, Dipl.-Ing.
Im Rummel 46
52159 Roetgen / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Bauer, Dirk, et al
Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka
Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB
Grüner Weg 1
52070 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Bauer, Dirk, et al
BAUER WAGNER PRIESMEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grüner Weg 1
52070 Aachen / DE
Former [2002/42]Bauer, Dirk, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Kfm., et al
Bauer & Bauer, Patentanwälte, Am Keilbusch 4
52080 Aachen / DE
Former [2000/04]Bauer, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Bauer & Bauer, Am Keilbusch 4
52080 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date99112889.303.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE1998103241518.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832415
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974275
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974275
Date:20.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A23L3/16, A23G1/02
[2000/04]
CPC:
A23L3/165 (EP); A23G1/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesAL05.04.2000
LT05.04.2000
LV05.04.2000
MK05.04.2000
RO05.04.2000
SI05.04.2000
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Sterilisation[2000/04]
English:Sterilisation process[2000/04]
French:Procédé de stérilisation[2000/04]
Examination procedure30.10.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
13.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/11]
08.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
03.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.2001Observations by third parties
04.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2001Fee for grant paid
09.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU03.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
[2004/39]
Former [2004/10]CY31.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US3721527  (ERNST T, et al) [A] 1-19 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 36 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]DE2513563  (AVCO CORP) [A] 1,3,6,7,10,19 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 *;
 [A]US4062646  (LODIGE WILHELM, et al) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-4 * * column 1, line 19 - line 25 * * column 2, line 1 - line 8 * * column 5, line 7 - line 12 *;
 [X]DE3111352  (J S PETZHOLDT GMBH & CO MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,10,13-15,18,19 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 3 * * example - * * claims 1,3 *;
 [A]DE4341316  (LEHMANN MASCHF F B [DE]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-5,7 *;
 [A]CH686810  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1-19 * page 2, line 5 - line 9 * * page 2, line 14 - line 20 * * page 2, line 51 - line 55 * * example 2 * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0770332  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,19 * column 2, line 13 - line 17 * * column 3, line 10 - line 18 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 4 ** claims 1,2 *
otherCH686546
 DE19612957
 EP0799574
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.