Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978418

EP0978418 - Mounting device in a vehicle with an extensible element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
For:DE 
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
For:DE 
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
For:DE 
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Widulle, Rüdiger
Eilandstrasse 8
81547 München / DE
02 / Schmidt, Michael
Gäustrasse 4
72218 Wildberg / DE
03 / Plocher, Bernd
Im Wiesengrund 24
72108 Rottenburg-Seebronn / DE
[2000/06]
Application number, filing date99112921.405.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813536405.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835364
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978418
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978418
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R7/06
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Einbau in einen Kraftwagen mit einem Ausziehteil[2000/06]
English:Mounting device in a vehicle with an extensible element[2000/06]
French:Dispositif de montage dans un véhicule avec un élément extensible[2000/06]
Examination procedure20.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2002Fee for grant paid
30.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5052728  (FUKUMOTO MASUMI [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * column A *;
 [X]EP0525811  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0610882  (KATO HATSUJO KAISHA LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0561332  (KATO HATSUJO KAISHA LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0561278  (KATO HATSUJO KAISHA LTD [JP]);
 [A]US4552399  (ATARASHI KAZUYA [JP]);
 [A]DE4130847  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]);
 [PA]DE19756908  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE])