Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977302

EP0977302 - Method for alignment of antennas on decentralised devices with a wireless connected central device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2005  [2005/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Deinzer, Arnulf, Dr.
Forstenrieder Allee 128
81476 München / DE
02 / Heinbach, Wolfgang, Dr.
Farmerstrasse 14e
82194 Gröbenzell / DE
03 / Mohr, Bernd
Awengen 5
88436 Eberhardzell / DE
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date99112979.205.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813377927.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833779
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977302
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977302
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/12, H04B7/24, H04B17/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2002/04]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Ausrichten von Antennen von dezentralen Einrichtungen auf eine mit diesen drahtlos verbundene zentrale Einrichtung[2000/05]
English:Method for alignment of antennas on decentralised devices with a wireless connected central device[2000/05]
French:Méthode pour aligner des antennes de dispositifs décentralisés sur un dispositif central connecté sans fil[2000/05]
Examination procedure21.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/46]
01.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/35]
10.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4893288  (MAIER GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9 * column 1; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE3723114  (DEUTSCHE BUNDESPOST [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,14 * columns 1-3; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0776062  (MASPRO DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * pages 5-6; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0687028  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9 * columns 3-5; figure 1 *