Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978293

EP0978293 - Irradiation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
uwe GmbH
Buchstrasse 82
73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
uwe GmbH
Buchstrasse 32
73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Heudorfer, Edgar
Saleuxer Strasse 8
73563 Mögglingen / DE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Wolf, Eckhard , et al
Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB
Tübinger Strasse 26
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99113011.306.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813580007.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835800
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978293
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978293
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978293
Date:09.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Bestrahlungsgerät[2000/06]
English:Irradiation apparatus[2000/06]
French:Appareil d'irradiation[2000/06]
Examination procedure29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
19.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2005Fee for grant paid
17.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200406   M06   Fee paid on   04.12.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.11.2005
FI09.11.2005
IT09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
AT06.07.2006
GB06.07.2006
IE06.07.2006
LU06.07.2006
BE31.07.2006
CH31.07.2006
FR31.07.2006
LI31.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI09.11.2005
IT09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
AT06.07.2006
GB06.07.2006
IE06.07.2006
LU06.07.2006
BE31.07.2006
CH31.07.2006
FR31.07.2006
LI31.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2008/23]FI09.11.2005
IT09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
AT06.07.2006
GB06.07.2006
IE06.07.2006
BE31.07.2006
CH31.07.2006
FR31.07.2006
LI31.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2008/16]FI09.11.2005
IT09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
AT06.07.2006
GB06.07.2006
IE06.07.2006
BE31.07.2006
CH31.07.2006
LI31.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/30]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
GB06.07.2006
IE06.07.2006
BE31.07.2006
CH31.07.2006
LI31.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/21]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2006/49]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
PT10.04.2006
Former [2006/38]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
GR09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/35]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
DK09.02.2006
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/33]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
ES20.02.2006
Former [2006/27]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
SE09.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI09.11.2005
NL09.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4324379  (UWE UNTERWASSER ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 43 - line 63; figure 6 *;
 [Y]US4754146  (PIRKL JOSEF [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 15 *;
 [A]DE8625588U  (WOLFF FRIEDRICH) [A] 6 * page 9, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]DE3544833  (KRATZ JOSEF GMBH [DE]) [A] 7-11 * column 2, line 23 - line 56 * * column 3, line 19 - line 29 * * column 4, line 24 - line 47; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO8706146  (SOLANA AB [SE]) [A] 7-11 * page 3, line 20 - line 26 *;
 [A]DE3440478  (ELECTROLUX KERN GMBH [DE]) [A] 8 * page 8 *