blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972972

EP0972972 - Operating method for a vehicle internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
80788 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lemberger, Heinz
Hofäckerallee 1
85774 Unterföhring / DE
02 / Leistner, Marian
Brettener Strasse 22
80939 München / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Wesel-Mair, Julia, et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Patentabteilung AJ-3
80788 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Wesel-Mair, Julia (DE), et al
Bayerische Motoren Werke AG Patentabteilung AJ-3
D-80788 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113016.206.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813151514.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831515
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972972
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972972
Date:19.09.2001
[2001/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972972
Date:21.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:F02D41/08, F02D41/12, F02D13/02, F02B29/02
[2003/33]
CPC:
F02D13/0234 (EP); F02D13/0261 (EP); F02D41/086 (EP);
F16H61/0437 (EP); Y02T10/12 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/03]F16H61/04, F02D41/08, F02D41/12, F02D13/02, F02B29/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Betriebsverfahren für eine Fahrzeug-Brennkraftmaschine[2000/03]
English:Operating method for a vehicle internal combustion engine[2000/03]
French:Méthode de fonctionnement pour un moteur automobile à combustion interne[2000/03]
Examination procedure26.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/19]
02.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2003Fee for grant paid
08.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4340614  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5199326  (IWATSUKI KUNIHIRO [US], et al) [Y] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4765288  (LINDER ERNST [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line 49 * * column 5, line 31 - line 32 *;
 [A]EP0446065  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 21 * * column 5, line 50 - line 51 * * column 6, line 2 - line 3 * * claims 1,3 *;
 [A]US5605128  (NUSSER CLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.