blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974411

EP0974411 - Engraved forming tool for forming by means of a pressure medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Meleghy Hydroforming GmbH & Co. KG
Schulstrasse 63
09125 Chemnitz / DE
[2001/42]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Dr. Meleghy Hydroforming GmbH & Co. KG
Kopernikusstrasse 60
08056 Zwickau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schulze, Bernd, Dr.-Ing.
Chemnitzer Strasse 17
09366 Niederdorf / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Rumrich, Gabriele
Patentanwältin
Limbacher Strasse 305
09116 Chemnitz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Rumrich, Gabriele
Limbacher Strasse 305
09116 Chemnitz / DE
Application number, filing date99113024.606.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813355024.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833550
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974411
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974411
Date:14.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B21D26/02
[2000/04]
CPC:
B21D26/047 (EP,US); B21D26/031 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:Werkzeuggravur eines Umformwerkzeuges zum Umformen mittels Wirkmedium[2000/04]
English:Engraved forming tool for forming by means of a pressure medium[2000/04]
French:Outillage de formage gravé pour formage par fluide sous pression[2000/04]
Examination procedure06.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
20.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2001Fee for grant paid
06.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
IE14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
AT06.07.2002
LU06.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
[2013/51]
Former [2004/43]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
IE14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
AT06.07.2002
LU06.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2004/39]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
AT06.07.2002
LU06.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2004/10]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
AT06.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
CY31.07.2002
Former [2004/03]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
AT06.07.2002
BE31.07.2002
Former [2003/51]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
BE31.07.2002
Former [2003/46]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
Former [2003/09]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
NL14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
Former [2003/01]FI14.11.2001
GB14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
Former [2002/49]FI14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
Former [2002/48]FI14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
SE14.02.2002
Former [2002/33]FI14.11.2001
SE14.02.2002
Former [2002/27]SE14.02.2002
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE4434799  (SMG SUEDDEUTSCHE MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 13; figures 1,2; claim 5 *;
 [A]DE4436437  (HDE METALLWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]DE19535870  (BLZ GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1* column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 29; figure 2; claim 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.