EP0970719 - Electrode structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kinbara, Matsuro, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Kohji, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2000/02] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113028.7 | 06.07.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | JP19980193387 | 08.07.1998 Original published format: JP 19338798 | JP19980357957 | 16.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35795798 | [2000/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0970719 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0970719 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
A61N1/044 (EP,US);
A61N1/0436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/02] | Title | German: | Elektrodenstruktur | [2000/02] | English: | Electrode structure | [2000/02] | French: | Structure d'électrode | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 24.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0513879 (DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-3,7 * page 7, line 51 - page 9, line 55; figures 11-16 *; | [AD]US5310403 (HAYNES JOHN L [US]) [AD] 1,2 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 56; figure 1 *; | [AD]US5284471 (SAGE JR BURTON H [US]) [AD] 1-3,5 * column 5, line 28 - column 9, line 59; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0461680 (DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 9, line 25 - page 10, line 57; figure - * | by applicant | US4416274 | US4950229 | US5284471 | US5310403 |