Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974699

EP0974699 - Screed for a road paver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABG Allgemeine Baumaschinen-Gesellschaft mbH
Kuhbrückenstrasse 18
31785 Hameln / DE
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Röwer, Helmut
Glatzer Strasse 15
31683 Obernkirchen / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Sparing Röhl Henseler
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/04]Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date99113029.506.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813339424.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833394
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974699
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974699
Date:31.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E01C19/42, F16B21/09
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Einbaubohle für einen Strassenfertiger[2000/04]
English:Screed for a road paver[2000/04]
French:Poutre lisseuse pour finisseur de chaussée[2000/04]
Examination procedure11.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
25.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.01.2004Fee for grant paid
21.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2555218  (VOEGELE AG J) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2204022  (WOLF GEB KASTNER HILDE) [A] 1,6,8 * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 24; figure - *;
 [A]WO9314324  (DZUS FASTENER EUROPE) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *