Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974759

EP0974759 - Anchoring device with biting helical toothing for application in an hole [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.03.2001
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.04.2001 [2001/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giovannetti, Antonio
Residenza Fontana-Milano 2
20090 Segrate (MI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Giovannetti, Antonio
Residenza Fontana-Milano 2
20090 Segrate (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Zavattoni, Maria Chiara , et al
Racheli & C. S.p.A. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date99113036.006.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI00498U17.07.1998         Original published format: IT MI980498 U
[2000/04]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974759
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16B15/06
[2000/04]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verankerungsvorrichtung mit schraubenförmiger Verzahnung zur Anwendung in einer Bohrung[2000/04]
English:Anchoring device with biting helical toothing for application in an hole[2000/04]
French:Dispositif d'ancrage à denture hélicoidale à utiliser dans un trou[2000/04]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/16]
13.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/16]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]FR1367196  (OTTAVIANO TRANIELLO) [X] 1-3,6-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR552928  (SOCIETE HEIL & PAUL) [X] 1,2,6-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]FR1087084  (RAMOS COLLADO & OSCOZ SANCHEZ) [X] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *