Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987054

EP0987054 - A method and apparatus for selective removal of carbon monoxide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit
Michigan 48202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
3044 West Grand Boulevard
Detroit Michigan 48202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Borup, Rodney L.
16 Harwood Lane
East Rochester, New York 14445 / US
02 / Skala, Glenn W.
17 Knollwood Drive
Churchville, New York 14428 / US
03 / Brundage, Mark A.
186 Thornell
Pittsford, New York 14534 / US
04 / Labarge, William J.
306 South Erie Street
Bay City, Michigan 48706 / US
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/12]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113065.906.07.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateUS1998015443416.09.1998         Original published format: US 154434
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0987054
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987054
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/86, H01M8/06, B01J23/46
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/49]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur selektiven Entfernung von Kohlenmonoxid[2000/12]
English:A method and apparatus for selective removal of carbon monoxide[2000/12]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour l'élimination sélective de monoxyde de carbone[2000/12]
Examination procedure27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
23.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
24.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2004Fee for grant paid
06.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR16.06.2004
IT16.06.2004
GB16.09.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR16.06.2004
GB16.09.2004
Former [2006/13]GB16.09.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0764466  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10,17,18 * page 1, line 55 - page 2, line 6; figure 1; examples 1,3 *;
 [X]US4994247  (TOOLEY PATRICIA A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,14,15 * columns 1-4 *;
 [A]US5238670  (LOUISE JEAN [FR], et al)