EP1024653 - Network facsimile apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic System Networks Co., Ltd. 1-62, Minoshima 4-chome Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka 812-8531 / JP | [2010/18] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Panasonic Communications Co., Ltd. 4-1-62, Minoshima, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8531 / JP | ||
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA GRAPHIC COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, INC. 3-8, Shimomeguro 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8687 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Junichi 3-1-21-403, Gumisawa, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 245-0061 / JP | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113071.7 | 06.07.1999 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | JP19990018930 | 27.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1893099 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1024653 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1024653 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024653 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
H04N1/00238 (EP,US);
H04N1/00236 (EP,US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0015 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/32] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Netzwerkfaksimilegerät | [2000/31] | English: | Network facsimile apparatus | [2000/31] | French: | Dispositif de télécopieur de réseau | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5559721 (ISHII TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1,9,11,13 * abstract ** claim 1 *; | [A]EP0789479 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,9,11,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 18 * * figures 2,4 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5675507 (BOBO II CHARLES R [US]) [A] 1,9,11,13 * abstract * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5848137 (HSIAO RAY-LING [TW]) [A] 1,9,11,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 39 - line 64 * * column 5, line 26 - line 35 * * figure 2 * |