Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974500

EP0974500 - Device for inflating an airbag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC.
5300 Old Tampa Highway, P.O. Box 33050
Lakeland, FL 33807-3050 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC.
5300 Old Tampa Highway, P.O. Box 33050
Lakeland, FL 33807-3050 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Specht, Martin
Im Harl 4
82340 Feldafing / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Nöth, Heinz
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt, Arnulfstrasse 25
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113146.707.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE1998213149U23.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29813149 U
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974500
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974500
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/26
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Aufblasen eines Luftsacks[2000/04]
English:Device for inflating an airbag[2000/04]
French:Dispositif de gonflage d'un coussin gonflable[2000/04]
Examination procedure30.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
25.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2003Fee for grant paid
02.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES09.05.2004
[2004/46]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9734785  (AIRBELT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 9, line 19 - line 29 * * page 16, line 17 - page 17, line 4 * [Y] 3;
 [AY]US4006919  (NEUMAN RICHARD F) [A] 1,2,4 * column A; figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 43 - column 7, line 21; figure 5 * [Y] 3;
 [X]US3815935  (JONES T) [X] 1,4 * column W *
by applicantEP0812741