Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971290

EP0971290 - Electronic apparatus detachable cartridge protection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.04.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.06.2003  [2003/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai
5-4, 2-chome, Komagata Taito-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai
5-4, 2-chome, Komagata
Taito-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Noriyasu, Kakuda C/O Koto, Ltd
325 Niohmon Tsukinuke-cho Kurumayachodori Nijoh
Sagaru Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP
02 / Satoshi, Oshita
C/O Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai 5-4 Komagata 2-chome
Taito-Ku Tokyo / JP
03 / Kousei, Kazeto C/O Koto Co, Ltd
325 Niohmon Tsukinuke-cho Kurumayachodori
Nijoh Sagaru Nakaygo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Alber, Norbert , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Alber, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113165.707.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019639910.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19639998
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971290
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/00, G06F12/14
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesAL12.07.2000
LT12.07.2000
LV12.07.2000
MK12.07.2000
RO12.07.2000
SI12.07.2000
TitleGerman:Electronisches Gerät mit Sicherung einer entfernbaren Kartusche[2000/02]
English:Electronic apparatus detachable cartridge protection[2000/02]
French:Dispositif electronique avec protection de cartouche amovible[2000/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
18.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
29.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/24]
10.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0426270  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5426762  (NAKAGAWA KATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column W *;
 [A]EP0363871  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *