Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971402

EP0971402 - Wafer for heavy metal monitoring and method for manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
NEC Electronics Corporation
1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sasaki, Yasushi
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113170.707.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019350709.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19350798
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971402
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/66
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wafer zur Überwachung von Schwermetallen und dessen Herstellungsmethode[2000/02]
English:Wafer for heavy metal monitoring and method for manufacturing same[2000/02]
French:Tranche semiconductrice pour la surveillance de métaux lourds et son procédé de fabrication[2000/02]
Examination procedure19.05.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05