blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971194

EP0971194 - Static heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WAP Reinigungssysteme GmbH & Co.
Guido-Oberdorfer-Strasse 2-8
89287 Bellenberg / DE
[2003/03]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
WAP Reinigungssysteme GmbH & Co.
Guido-Oberdorfer-Strasse 2-8
D-89287 Bellenberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Goerke, Harry
Hammerwerk 9
89165 Dietenheim / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt
Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
Application number, filing date99113248.108.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE19982012232U09.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29812232 U
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971194
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971194
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971194
Date:15.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2000
ClassificationIPC:F28D7/02, F24H1/00
[2000/02]
CPC:
F24H1/165 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   IT [2001/26]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stehender Wärmetauscher[2000/02]
English:Static heat exchanger[2000/02]
French:Echangeur de chaleur statique[2000/02]
Examination procedure20.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
12.04.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.08.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2002Fee for grant paid
26.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.05.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2091365  (SULZER AG) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8601282  (VULCAN AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1-13 * page 16, line 30 - page 18, line 5; figure 11 * * page 19, line 6 - line 9; figure 13 *;
 [A]DE9310430U  (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR985262  (ALICK CLARKSON) [A] 1 * page 3, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.