Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971344

EP0971344 - Optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2009
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.04.2009  [2009/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/20]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ono, Toshitsugu
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kondo, Hirofumi
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Sakamoto, Tetsuhiro
c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113267.108.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019453709.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19453798
JP1998031147330.10.1998         Original published format: JP 31147398
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971344
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971344
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP0971344
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/24
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [2000/39]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium[2000/02]
English:Optical recording medium[2000/02]
French:Médium d' enregistrement optique[2000/02]
Examination procedure13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
29.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2008Fee for grant paid
28.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH10110118  ;
 [Y]JPH0349053  ;
 [A]US5284884  (UEYAMA KENICHI [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 14 *;
 [Y]DE4222448  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1 * claim 5 *;
 [Y]JPS6435722  ;
 [Y]JPS6433719  ;
 [A]JPH03176832
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 27, Database accession no. 1998-306208, XP002120601 & JPH10110118 A 19980428 (TORAY) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 15, Database accession no. 1991-106378, XP002120602 & JPH0349053 A 19910301 (KASEI) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 11, Database accession no. 1989-082015, XP002120603 & JPS6435722 A 19890206 (SONY) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 11, Database accession no. 1989-081266, XP002120604 & JPS6433719 A 19890212 (SONY) [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 37, Database accession no. 1991-269912, XP002120605 & JPH03176832 A 00000000 (FUJITSU) [A] 12 * abstract *