Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970649

EP0970649 - Frying and cooking vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.07.2002  [2002/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nasi, Mauro
Via Abetone Superiore, 279
41053 Maranell (MO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Oregon S.r.l.
Via della Stazione, 43
41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Nasi, Mauro
Via Abetone Superiore 279
41053 Maranello (MO) / IT
[2000/02]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/17]
Former [2000/02]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113278.808.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateDE1998212263U09.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29812263 U
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970649
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:A47J37/12
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Frittier- und Kochgerät[2000/02]
English:Frying and cooking vessel[2000/02]
French:Appareil de friture et de cuisson[2000/02]
Examination procedure10.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
15.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
08.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/29]
18.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/29]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]NL9101807  (HEGRO B V) [X] 1-10,12-14,17 * page 7, line 4 - page 11, line 19; figure 2 * [Y] 11;
 [Y]DE29713120U  (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI GRANDI IMPI [IT]) [Y] 11 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE8626638U  (GRÜN) [X] 1-7,15,17 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 4; figure - *;
 [X]EP0083429  (NIRO PLAN AG [CH]) [X] 1-9,17 * page 2, line 36 - page 6, line 18; figures 1,3 *
by applicantDE738120
 FR2086562
 WO9315643
 WO9619934
 DE2256108
 US5165330