Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981977

EP0981977 - Locking of a pivoting leg, fixed under a table top [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neuland GmbH Kommunikationssysteme
Am Kreuzacker 7, Industriepark Rhön
36124 Eichenzell / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
Neuland GmbH Kommunikationssysteme
Am Kreuzacker 7, Industriepark Rhön
36124 Eichenzell / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Neuland, Erich
Peter-Henlein-Strasse 26
36093 Künzell / DE
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Hebing, Norbert , et al
Patentanwälte Schlagwein + Hebing
Frankfurter Strasse 34
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]Hebing, Norbert , et al
Patentanwälte Schlagwein + Hebing, Frankfurter Strasse 34
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
Former [2000/09]Schlagwein, Udo, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Frankfurter Strasse 34
61231 Bad Nauheim / DE
Application number, filing date99113289.509.07.1999
[2000/09]
Priority number, dateDE1998214597U14.08.1998         Original published format: DE 29814597 U
[2000/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981977
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981977
Date:11.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47B3/08
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/46]
Former [2000/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesRO17.08.2000
TitleGerman:Arretierung für ein schwenkbar an einer Tischplatte befestigtes Tischbein[2000/09]
English:Locking of a pivoting leg, fixed under a table top[2000/09]
French:Blocage d'un pied de table pivotant fixé à un plateau de table[2000/09]
Examination procedure17.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
02.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
08.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2003Fee for grant paid
26.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.02.2004
NL11.02.2004
BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/12]NL11.02.2004
BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
Former [2005/51]BE31.07.2004
CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
Former [2005/25]CH31.07.2004
LI31.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1654640  (LIENERT BENEDIKT) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH588230  (HOCHSTRASSER PETER) [A] 1 * the whole document *