Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972891

EP0972891 - Fixing device for fixing sheets of glass to building façades [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2001/20]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE
"Les Miroirs", 18 Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Dirisamer, Wolfgang
Keplerstrasse 5
4040 Linz / AT
02 / Leopoldseder, Roland
Rubringerstrasse 14
4300 St. Valentin / AT
03 / Eckelt, Christian
Fischhubweg 14
4400 Steyr / AT
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Dederichs, August , et al
Saint-Gobain, Patentabteilung, Viktoriaallee 3-5
52066 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Dederichs, August , et al
Saint-Gobain, Patentabteilung, Viktoriaallee 3-5
52066 Aachen / DE
Former [2000/03]Biermann, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. (Pat-Ass.) , et al
SEKURIT SAINT-GOBAIN DEUTSCHLAND GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Viktoriaallee 3-5
52066 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date99113308.309.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813145314.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831453
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972891
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972891
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972891
Date:14.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/08, F16B37/04
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für die Befestigung von Glasscheiben an Gebäudefassaden[2000/03]
English:Fixing device for fixing sheets of glass to building façades[2000/03]
French:Dispositif pour la fixation de panneaux de verre contre des façades de bâtiments[2000/03]
Examination procedure03.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
22.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2003Fee for grant paid
21.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.07.2003
MC31.07.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/36]CY09.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3927653  (DANZ ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 23; figure . *;
 [A]EP0784129  (PILKINGTON UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6,7 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 55; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0485670  (NIC AUTOTEC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 35 * * column 5, line 15 - line 49; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US4948313  (ZANKOVICH THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 49; figures 1-8 *
ExaminationDE19507715