Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971130

EP0971130 - Scroll compressor with anti-rotation mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshiyuki, Nakane, c/o Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisak.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Toshiro, Fujii, c/o Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisak.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Naoya, Yokomachi, c/o Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisak.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Shinya, Yamamoto, c/o Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisak.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
05 / Kazuo, Murakami, c/o Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisak.
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois , et al
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18
80019 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113331.509.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019623010.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19623098
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971130
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971130
Date:04.07.2001
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971130
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:F04C18/02
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2002/13]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spiralverdichter mit rotationsverhindernden Mitteln[2000/02]
English:Scroll compressor with anti-rotation mechanism[2000/02]
French:Compresseur à spirales avec dispositif contre la rotation[2000/02]
Examination procedure09.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
01.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2003Fee for grant paid
07.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5154592  (OHTANI IWAO ET AL) [X] 1-5,7,12 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 42; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]JPS5830403  ;
 [X]JPH04128581  ;
 [X]JPS5870003  ;
 [X]JPS5830404  ;
 [X]JPS5830402  ;
 [X]US4731000  (HAAG GOTTLOB) [X] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830513), vol. 007, no. 110, Database accession no. (M - 214), & JP58030403 A 19830222 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,5,6,8,11 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920819), vol. 016, no. 391, Database accession no. (M - 1298), & JP04128581 A 19920430 (TOKICO LTD) [X] 1,5,10 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830716), vol. 007, no. 163, Database accession no. (M - 229), & JP58070003 A 19830426 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830513), vol. 007, no. 110, Database accession no. (M - 214), & JP58030404 A 19830222 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830513), vol. 007, no. 110, Database accession no. (M - 214), & JP58030402 A 19830222 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *