Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971271

EP0971271 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Change - representativepublished on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yuji, Nakayama, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Koji, Yamazaki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Masaya, Kawada, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Takaaki, Kaya, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Hironori, Owaki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2005/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/38]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18
80019 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113332.309.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019580710.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19580798
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971271
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03G5/082
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Apparat für die Herstellung von Bildern[2000/02]
English:Image forming apparatus[2000/02]
French:Appareil pour la production d' images[2000/02]
Examination procedure05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
21.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0825493  (CANON) [X] 1 * figures 5A-C,7; claims 1,6-10; tables 1,6,9-12,14-17 *;
 [X]EP0809153  (CANON) [X] 1 * claims 10,12; tables 1-6 *;
 [X]EP0785475  (CANON) [X] 1 * claim 1; tables 1,3,5,11,13,15,18 *