Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994056

EP0994056 - Center drive unwind system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.08.2005  [2005/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paper Converting Machine Company
2300 South Ashland Avenue Green Bay
Wisconsin 54307-9005 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Paper Converting Machine Company
2300 South Ashland Avenue
Green Bay, Wisconsin 54307-9005 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Klimek, Wayne D.
1185 Alice Drive
Green Bay, Wisconsin 54304 / US
02 / Moran, Daniel J.
1300 East Wyndmere Drive
Appleton, Wisconsin 54913 / US
 [2001/46]
Former [2000/16]01 / Klimek, Wayne D.
1185 Alice Drive
Green Bay, Wisconsin 54304 / US
Representative(s)Ruschke, Hans Edvard , et al
Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen
Postfach 86 06 29
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113351.309.07.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017052013.10.1998         Original published format: US 170520
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994056
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994056
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65H19/12
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abwickelsystem mit Zentralantrieb[2000/16]
English:Center drive unwind system[2000/16]
French:Système de déroulage avec entraînement central[2000/16]
Examination procedure26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
20.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2004Fee for grant paid
07.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4892610  (SANO SHOZO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,11,13 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 33 * [Y] 5,6;
 [X]US4828199  (ANNACKER HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2248996  (FACONNAGE PAPIER CIE FRANCO SU [FR]) [Y] 5 * figure 2 *;
 [Y]GB2195322  (ISOWA INDUSTRY CO) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 1 - line 22 * * page 2, line 128 - page 3, line 60 *;
 [A]DE19637770  (KOENIG & BAUER ALBERT AG [DE]) [A] 2 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 33; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0349705  (KLEINEWEFERS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * column 8, line 5 - column 9, line 6; figure - *