Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972628

EP0972628 - Lamination molding resin-coated sand and lamination molding method using resin-coated sand [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  02.04.2010
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 05.05.2010  [2010/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yukio, Otsuka, c/oToyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
02 / Motoaki, Ozaki, c/oToyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [2000/03]Winter, Brandl & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99113361.209.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998019775413.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19775498
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972628
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972628
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29C67/00, // B22F3/105
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kunststoffbeschichteter Sand und seine Verwendung bei einem Laminierungsverfahren[2000/03]
English:Lamination molding resin-coated sand and lamination molding method using resin-coated sand[2000/03]
French:Sable enrobé de résine et son utilisation pour une méthode de laminage[2000/03]
Examination procedure09.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
17.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2004Fee for grant paid
29.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005   
EOS GmbH Electro Optical Systems
Robert-Stirling-Ring 1
82152 Krailling / DE
Opponent's representative
Hofer, Dorothea, et al
Prüfer & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/33]
Opponent(s)01  22.06.2005   
EOS GmbH Electro Optical Systems
Robert-Stirling-Ring 1
82152 Krailling / DE
Opponent's representative
Hofer, Dorothea, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d
81545 München / DE
17.08.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.12.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.04.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.02.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/18]
Appeal following opposition26.06.2007Appeal received No.  T1047/07
27.08.2007Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
23.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0776713  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 13, line 9 - line 30 * * column 19, line 41 - column 20, line 12; figure 20 *;
 [X]WO9729148  (DTM CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 1 * * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 12 * * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 11; figures 4A,4B; example . *;
 [A]WO9630195  (DTM CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 9, line 11 - page 11, line 32 *;
 [A]EP0555896  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 43; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9530503  (DTM CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * page 18, line 12 - line 20; figure 7; claims 1,5,12 *