Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977319

EP0977319 - A female terminal for a connector and a housing therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Solderless Terminal Mfg. Co., Ltd.
4-8, Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
Japan Solderless Terminal Mfg. Co., Ltd.
4-8, Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Ping, Japan Solderless Term. Mfg. Co., Ltd.
G1 Central Office, Mac Bldg., Futatsuike 33-5
Nihongi-cho, Anjou-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[2000/19]
Former [2000/05]01 / Chen, Ping, Solderless Terminal Mfg. Co., Ltd.
G1 Central Office, Mac Bldg., Futatsuike 33-5
Nihongi-cho, Anjou-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Representative(s)Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113384.410.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateJP1998021975316.07.1998         Original published format: JP 21975398
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977319
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977319
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977319
Date:03.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/436, H01R13/115, H01R4/18, H01R13/422
[2000/51]
Former International [2000/05]H01R13/436, H01R13/115, H01R4/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/36]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kontaktbüchse für einen Verbinder und Gehäuse dafür[2000/05]
English:A female terminal for a connector and a housing therefor[2000/05]
French:Contact femelle pour un connecteur et boîtier correspondant[2000/05]
Examination procedure25.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/30]
25.05.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
17.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2006Fee for grant paid
01.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9818181  (WHITAKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *;
 [YA]US5653613  (SHIMODA KEIZOU [JP]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 5;
 [YA]US3083351  (NIELSEN JR AUKER J) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4
ExaminationJPH05135819