Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972454

EP0972454 - Use of sulfur containing organic compounds as agents for bathochromically shifting the UV/vis-absorption bands of carotenoids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]Use of sulfur containing organic compounds as agents for bathochromically shifting the UV/vis-absorption bands of carotenoids
[2000/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2003/42]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Auweter, Helmut, Dr.
Lessingstrasse 35
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
02 / Bohn, Heribert
Jakob-Ries-Strasse 10
67319 Wattenheim / DE
03 / Horn, Dieter, Dr.
Schröderstrasse 69
69120 Heidelberg / DE
04 / Krämer, Klaus, Dr.
Daniel-Knobloch-Strasse 4
76829 Landau / DE
05 / Paust, Joachim, Dr.
Ringstrasse 3
67141 Neuhofen / DE
06 / Weiss, Horst, Dr.
Jahnstrasse 23
67141 Neuhofen / DE
[2000/03]
Application number, filing date99113420.612.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE199813186516.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19831865
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972454
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972454
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972454
Date:15.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/272, A23L1/275
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesRO18.01.2000
SI18.01.2000
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Schwefel-organischen Verbindungen als Mittel zur bathochromen Verschiebung der UV/Vis-Absorptionsbande von Carotinoiden[2000/03]
English:Use of sulfur containing organic compounds as agents for bathochromically shifting the UV/vis-absorption bands of carotenoids[2002/51]
French:Utilisation de composés organiques contenant du soufre comme agents pour déplacer bathochromiquement les bandes d'absorption dans l'uv et le visible des caroténoides[2000/03]
Former [2000/03]Use of sulfur containing organic compounds as agents for bathochromically shifting the UV/vis-absorption bands of carotenoids
Examination procedure18.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
04.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2003Fee for grant paid
12.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
GR15.01.2004
PT15.03.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]CY15.10.2003
FI15.10.2003
GR15.01.2004
Former [2004/33]FI15.10.2003
GR15.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI15.10.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]GB921306  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 4 * figure 11 *;
 DK71108  [ ] (J.E. NYROP);
 [AD]EP0551638  (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 7,15 * claim - *
 [X]  - F. FEICHTMAYER ET AL, TETRAHEDRON, (1969), vol. 25, no. 22, pages 5383 - 5408, XP002124303 [X] 1,2 * Seiten 5391-5393 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)83039-8
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19510110), vol. 45, no. 1, Database accession no. 372f, XP002124304 [A] 4 * abstract *