Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0974828
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.07.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.09.2003 |
First examination report |
|
02.09.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.10.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
01.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.10.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
25.08.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |
23.06.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] |
23.06.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] |
07.04.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
11.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |