Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974828

EP0974828 - Method of keeping inspection window of measuring device clean, and measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metso Paper Automation OY
Lentokentänkatu 11
33900 Tampere / FI
[2001/50]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
Neles Paper Automation Oy
Lentokentänkatu 11
33900 Tampere / FI
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Valmet Automation Inc.
Panuntie 6
00620 Helsinki / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Saikanmäki, Timo
Kemiankatu 1 A 1
33720 Tampere / FI
02 / Moisio, Hannu
Kortekuja 1
36220 Kangasala / FI
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Chivarov, Georgi , et al
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Chivarov, Georgui, Dr. Dipl.Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113422.212.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateFI1998000160714.07.1998         Original published format: FI 981607
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974828
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/15
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Reinhalten eines Inspektionsfensters einer Messvorrichtung, und Messvorrichtung[2000/04]
English:Method of keeping inspection window of measuring device clean, and measuring device[2000/04]
French:Procédé permettant de garder propre la fenêtre d'inspection d'un dispositif de mesure, et dispositif de mesure[2000/04]
Examination procedure28.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
22.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/34]
09.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4266142  (CRAWFORD JUAN H) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - line 14 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 9 * * column 5, line 21 - line 59 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 22 * * figures 1,4-6,10 * [Y] 3,10;
 [Y]US5233195  (HELLSTROM AKE A [US], et al) [Y] 3,10 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - line 37 * * column 14, line 33 - line 48 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5457539  (STURM STEVEN P [US]) [A] 7,14 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 2 * * column 7, line 11 - line 16 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US3662174  (MCMULLEN JAMES M, et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,13 * abstract * * column 4, line 9 - line 70 * * figures 5,7 *;
 [X]US4767935  (ANDERSON LEONARD M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 3 - line 26 * * figure 3 *