Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971008

EP0971008 - Bright metallic intaglio ink composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  17.10.2008
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canadian Bank Note Company, Limited
145 Richmond Road Ottawa
Ontario K1Z 1A1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
CANADIAN BANK NOTE COMPANY, LTD.
145 Richmond Road
Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 1A1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Lyen, Eric A.
67 Amberwood Crescent
Nepean, Ontario K2E 7C2 / CA
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Rottmann, Maximilian
Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG
Gartenstrasse 28 A
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Rottmann, Maximilian R.
c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37
8052 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date99113427.112.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateCA1998224301810.07.1998         Original published format: CA 2243018
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971008
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971008
Date:17.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/02
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Glänzende metallische Tiefdrucktintenzusammensetzung[2000/02]
English:Bright metallic intaglio ink composition[2000/02]
French:Composition d'encre métallique brillante pour héliographie[2000/02]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
10.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2005Fee for grant paid
11.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.05.2006   
SICPA S.A.
Av. de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Opponent's representative
Welch, Andreas, et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2006/25]
Opponent(s)01  17.05.2006   
SICPA S.A.
Av. de Florissant 41
1008 Prilly / CH
Opponent's representative
Welch, Andreas, et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
22.06.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.07.2008
26.06.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.07.2008Date of oral proceedings
04.07.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
14.07.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
CY17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
FR17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
GB12.07.2006
IE12.07.2006
LU12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
CH31.07.2007
LI31.07.2007
[2009/02]
Former [2008/52]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
FR17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
GB12.07.2006
IE12.07.2006
LU12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
CH31.07.2007
LI31.07.2007
Former [2008/36]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
GB12.07.2006
IE12.07.2006
LU12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
FR18.08.2006
CH31.07.2007
LI31.07.2007
Former [2008/24]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
GB12.07.2006
IE12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
FR18.08.2006
CH31.07.2007
LI31.07.2007
Former [2008/16]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
IT17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
GB12.07.2006
IE12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
FR18.08.2006
Former [2007/30]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
GB12.07.2006
IE12.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
FR18.08.2006
Former [2007/21]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
MC31.07.2006
FR18.08.2006
Former [2007/18]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
FR18.08.2006
Former [2006/36]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
DE18.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/26]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
DK17.11.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/25]AT17.08.2005
BE17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
PT17.01.2006
Former [2006/14]AT17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
NL17.08.2005
GR17.11.2005
SE17.11.2005
ES28.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT17.08.2005
FI17.08.2005
SE17.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2610944  (CAREY LISE [FR]) [A] 1,2,6,8,13 * page 1, lines 1-17 * * page 2, lines 7-18 * * page 2, lines 32-36 *;
 [A]GB2231572  (RUE COMPANY P L C DE [GB]) [A] 1,2,6,8,13 * page 3, lines 3-23 * * page 5, lines 18-35 * * page 7, lines 8-25 *;
 [A]US3957694  (BOLON DONALD A, et al) [A] 1,2,6,8,13 * column 2, lines 18-63 * * column 4, lines 53-66 *;
 [A]US4221593  (KUBO HIROTUGU)