Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972672

EP0972672 - Foldable vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2001 [2001/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Central Motor Co., Ltd.
4-12, Ohyama-cho Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Central Motor Co., Ltd.
4-12, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saitou, Masahiro
Central Motor Co., Ltd., 4-12, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Saitou, Hiroyuki
Central Motor Co., Ltd., 4-12, Ohyama-cho
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Beppu, Yasushi
23, Yatsu-cho, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113455.212.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998020322317.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20322398
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972672
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/36, B60N2/46
[2000/03]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Klappbar Fahrzeugsitz[2000/03]
English:Foldable vehicle seat[2000/03]
French:Siège de véhicule pliable[2000/03]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/17]
08.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/17]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5290092  (GEER ELIOT H) [X] 1 * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]US3612606  (SWENSON RICHARD F) [A] 1-3 * column A; figures 1-17 *;
 [A]US3550958  (KREIN REUBEN J) [A] 1-3 * column A; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US2621708  (LUCE)