Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978603

EP0978603 - Multi-part clip for façades [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reinwarth, Klaus
Ernst-Mey-Strasse 1
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Schäfer, Wolfgang , et al
Dreiss Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Schäfer, Wolfgang , et al
Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/06]Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Dreiss + Partner, Gerokstr. 6
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99113480.013.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE1998214097U06.08.1998         Original published format: DE 29814097 U
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978603
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E04F13/08
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mehrteilige Fassadenklammer[2000/06]
English:Multi-part clip for façades[2000/06]
French:Attache en plusieurs parties pour façades[2000/06]
Examination procedure23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
10.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE
08.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE
03.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/12]
17.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3432513  (GARTNER & CO J [DE]) [X] 1-7,9 * page 14, line 1 - page 20, line 34; figures 1-13 * [Y] 8;
 [X]EP0045978  (HAASE WALTER) [X] 1-4,7-9 * page 4, line 7 - page 13, line 6; figures 1-11 *;
 [X]US4570401  (UEBEL PHILIPP [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2853870  (SINNER JOHN B, et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 53; figures 1-5 *;
 [YA]DE2236922  (ABERLE JULIUS) [Y] 8 * page 8, line 18 - page 12, line 15; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,2,4-6;
 [DA]DE19617269  (BWM DUEBEL & MONTAGETECH [DE]) [DA] 1,5,7,8 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 51; figures 1-11 *
by applicantDE19617269