Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976349

EP0976349 - Inflatable contoured lying or seating surface comprising support and/or envelope [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.05.2003  [2003/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seidl, Sandra
Reutegasse 19 b
6901 Bregenz / AT
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
Application number, filing date99113485.913.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813438630.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19834386
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0976349
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0976349
Date:30.01.2002
[2002/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47G9/00, A47C27/08
[2000/05]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufblasbare konturierte Liege- oder Sitzfläche mit Auflage und/oder Umhüllung[2000/05]
English:Inflatable contoured lying or seating surface comprising support and/or envelope[2000/05]
French:Surface profilée gonflable de siège ou de lit comprenant support et/ou enveloppe[2000/05]
Examination procedure31.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/19]
21.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.09.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.09.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2002
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4965899  (SEKIDO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5044030  (BALATON JAMES I [US]) [X] 1-3,5,9,12 * column 3, line 29 - column 6, line 24 *;
 [X]US3705429  (NAIL WALTER P) [X] 2-5,7,9,11,12 * column 2, line 9 - column 5, line 12 *;
 [XA]US5555580  (HSIA YU CHUN [TW]) [X] 2,3,5,7,9,12 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 20 * [A] 13;
 [X]FR1050180  (REIFENBERG C) [X] 2,3,7-9,11 * page 1, column 1 - page 2, column 2 *;
 [X]EP0094985  (MADSEN HENNING [ES]) [X] 2-4 * page 3 *;
 [A]JPH0984677  ;
 [A]DE29804083U  (NEUFELD GMBH [DE]) [A] 10 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2748399  (JOSEPH ROCKOFF) [A] 1 * figures 2,3,5 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09084677 A 19970331 (KOMATSU DENSHI KK) [A] 6 * abstract *