Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974843

EP0974843 - Rotary encoder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2013/25]
Former [2008/29]For all designated states
Continental Automotive GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bender, Klaus-W.
Hermann-Löns-Strasse 9
35516 Münzenberg / DE
02 / Müller, Elke
Zollstock 28
35633 Lahnau / DE
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Rassler, Andrea
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99113500.513.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateDE199813267821.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19832678
[2000/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974843
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974843
Date:08.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/23]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0974843
Date:19.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01P13/04, G01P3/486, H01H25/06, G01D5/25
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehgeber[2000/04]
English:Rotary encoder[2000/04]
French:Codeur tournant[2000/04]
Examination procedure14.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2004Date of oral proceedings
03.12.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2005Fee for grant paid
04.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.03.2006  10.04.2006  ADMISSIBLE
VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES S.A.S
8 Rue Louis LORMAND, La Verrière
BP 513
78320 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstraße 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/17]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2006  10.04.2006  ADMISSIBLE
VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES S.A.S.
8 Rue Louis LORMAND, La Verrière BP 513
78320 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstraße 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
Former [2010/20]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2006  10.04.2006  ADMISSIBLE
VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES S.A.S.
8 Rue Louis LORMAND, La Verrière BP 513
78320 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Léveillé, Christophe
Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin
FR-75008 Paris / FR
Former [2006/17]
Opponent(s)01  06.03.2006   
VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES S.A.S.
8 Rue Louis LORMAND, La Verrière BP 513
78320 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR
18.04.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.11.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.05.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2010
19.05.2010Date of oral proceedings
26.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.04.2012Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.04.2012Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.06.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.10.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.05.2013Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0717424  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,12,19,20 * column 6, line 8 - column 8, line 53 * * column 12, line 56 - column 13, line 22; figures 6-8,19A,B * [Y] 24;
 [X]US5373142  (OHSHIMA KOHSHOU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 4, line 27 - line 59; figures 3A-4 *;
 [A]JPH0962345  ;
 [DY]DE3015971  (BRAUN AG [DE]) [DY] 24 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line L; figure - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 199, no. 707, [A] 1 * abstract *
OppositionUS5373142
 WO9815963