Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977234

EP0977234 - Trip device for a ground fault circuit breaker and circuit for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB PATENT GmbH
Wallstadter Strasse 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
[2001/42]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
ABB PATENT GmbH
Kallstadter Strasse 1
68309 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krokoszinski, Hans-Joachim, Dr.rer.nat
Albert-Schweitzer-Ring 3
69226 Nussloch / DE
02 / Popa, Heinz-Erich, Dr.-Ing.
Ringstrasse 57
69245 Bammental / DE
03 / Siedelhofer, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing.
Max-Reger-Strasse 16
69121 Heidelberg / DE
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Miller, Toivo , et al
ABB Patent GmbH
Postfach 1140
68520 Ladenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Miller, Toivo , et al
ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51
68128 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date99113505.402.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateDE199813382928.07.1998         Original published format: DE 19833829
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0977234
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0977234
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01H83/14, H01H71/32
[2000/46]
Former International [2000/05]H01H83/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR [2001/31]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI28.07.1999
TitleGerman:Auslöseeinrichtung für einen Fehlerstromschutzschalter und Schaltungsanordnung zur Ansteuerung derselben[2000/05]
English:Trip device for a ground fault circuit breaker and circuit for controlling the same[2000/05]
French:Dispositif de déclenchement pour un disjoncteur à courant de défaut et circuit de commande approprié[2000/05]
Examination procedure10.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
03.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
17.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2001
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9202944  (BTICINO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0851450  (MAIER & CIE C [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3823101  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0154619  (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME AG OESTER [AT]) [A] 1 * abstract *