blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0977234 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0977234



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 63
16.07.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.06.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
17.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
04.09.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
03.09.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.08.2001 Request for change of address Search / examination 8
21.11.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.10.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
22.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 2
02.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
02.07.1999 Description Search / examination 10
02.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
02.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 17
02.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6