blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0977234


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  13.08.2003  [2003/33]
12.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
30.08.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
18.10.2001 Change - extension states
19.09.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
19.09.2001 Renewal fee
31.08.2001 Change - applicant published on  17.10.2001 [2001/42]
30.08.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
15.06.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  01.08.2001 [2001/31]
17.11.2000 Request for examination filed published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
29.09.2000 Publication of search report published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
29.09.2000 Change - classification published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
17.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.02.2000 [2000/05]
06.08.1999 Change - extension states