blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0977234
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0977234Global Dossier 15.11.2000A3
EP0977234 02.02.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19833829 28.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19833829 03.02.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19833829 28.07.1998