blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0977234

Designated contracting statesAT 
DE 
FR 
Examination procedure17.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.2001
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.02.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT DE FR
 
Event date:02.02.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990728
 
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19990728
 
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7H 01H 83/14 A, 7H 01H 71/32 B
 
Event date:03.01.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20001110
 
Event date:01.08.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT DE FR
 
Event date:01.08.2001 
Event description:PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES
Free Format Text:SI PAYMENT 19990728
 
Event date:17.10.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:ABB PATENT GMBH
 
Event date:13.08.2003 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20030203