Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0972684 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0972684



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 69
14.07.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
31.07.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.06.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.06.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.06.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
12.02.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.02.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
12.02.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
16.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
21.10.2002 Description Search / examination 1
21.10.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.06.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.06.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
23.08.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
11.07.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
25.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.11.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
11.11.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.11.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
30.07.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 9
05.07.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.07.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
05.07.1999 Description Search / examination 5
05.07.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
05.07.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6