Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0972684


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.07.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.09.2004  [2004/36]
27.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
25.07.2003 (Expected) grant published on  10.09.2003  [2003/37]
17.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.07.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.02.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.10.2002 Examination report or reply
16.07.2002 Renewal fee
07.06.2002 First examination report
05.06.2002 Examination report or reply
19.07.2001 Renewal fee
01.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
24.10.2000 Loss of particular rights
09.10.2000 Change - extension states
19.08.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
18.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
21.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]
03.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]