Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0972684
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59906927D 16.10.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE59906927 05.07.1999
DE29812435 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000038109Global Dossier 08.02.2000A
Priority number Date
DE29812435 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0972684Global Dossier 10.09.2003B1
EP0972684 19.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE29812435 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE29812435U 12.11.1998U1
Priority number Date
DE29812435 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2207084T 16.05.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE29812435 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HU9902364 28.05.2000A1
HU9902364D 28.09.1999D0
Priority number Date
DE29812435 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6158685 12.12.2000A
Priority number Date
DE29812435 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9904440 28.01.2000B
Priority number Date
DE29812435 13.07.1998