Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972684

EP0972684 - Locking mechanism for a safety belt retractor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 20
73551 Alfdorf / DE
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Kielwein, Thomas
Batschenhofer Strasse 36
73569 Eschach / DE
02 / Rink, Jürgen
Gmünder Strasse 55
73550 Waldstetten / DE
03 / Schmid, Johannes
Hauptstrasse 124
73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys.
Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113519.505.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateDE1998212435U13.07.1998         Original published format: DE 29812435 U
[2000/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972684
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972684
Date:10.09.2003
Language:DE
[2003/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/405
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sperrmechanismus für einen Sicherheitsgurtaufroller[2000/03]
English:Locking mechanism for a safety belt retractor[2000/03]
French:Mécanisme de blocage pour un enrouleur de ceinture de sécurité[2000/03]
Examination procedure12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
11.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2003Fee for grant paid
18.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
23.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE10.12.2003
[2004/16]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2751362  (TAKATA KOJYO CO) [A] 1,5 * page 9, line 7 - page 12, paragraph L; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5071194  (FOEHL ARTUR) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 3-32; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4858847  (OGRIS GOTTFRIED) [A] 1 * column 3, paragraph L - column 4, line 15; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE2722744  (HILDEBRANDT ECKHARD DR ING) [A] 1 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph L; figures 1,2 *