Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971452

EP0971452 - Waterproof connector and waterproof rubber member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukuda, Masaru, Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
206-1, Nunobikibara, Haibara-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka-ken 421-0407 / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99113551.806.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019071606.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19071698
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971452
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971452
Date:14.03.2001
[2001/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/52
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/49]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wasserdichter Verbinder und wasserdichtes Gummielement[2000/02]
English:Waterproof connector and waterproof rubber member[2000/02]
French:Connecteur étanche et un élément étanche en caoutchouc[2000/02]
Examination procedure06.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
25.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/16]
12.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9736346  (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *;
 [X]DE19707988  (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [X] 7 * figure 3A *;
 [A]US5618206  (SAWADA YOSHITSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *